Camara et al v. Matheson Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mahamet Camara, Moussa Dembele, Andre De Oliveira, Bemba Diallo, Salif Diallo, Macire Diarra, Dominique Dickerson, Ernie Duke, Mohamed Kaba, Dean Patricelli and Ernest Williams
Defendant: Matheson Trucking, Inc., Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc. and Mark Matheson
Case Number: 1:2012cv03040
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 271 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice and Request for Court to Retain Jurisdiction as indicated in the attached Order. All outstanding motions ( 198 , 203 , 204 , 205 , 209 , 210 , 213 , 230 , 231 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/10/2016. (athom, )
November 23, 2015 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 266 Motion for Stay of Proceedings. ORDERED that on or before January 15, 2016, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report, provided they have not yet filed a stipulation to dismiss this action by that date. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/23/15.(jhawk, )
June 2, 2015 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 249 Joint Proposal for Revised Deadlines for Post-Trial Proceedings. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/02/2015. (athom, )
April 24, 2015 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 238 Notice of Bankruptcy. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/24/2015. (athom, )
January 13, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and reserving ruling in part 131 Motion to Exclude. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/13/2015. (athom, )
September 23, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion to Strike ; granting 98 Motion for Leave. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/23/2014.(athom, )
February 5, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice the claims against Mark Matheson by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/5/14. (dkals, )
October 17, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice the claims of Plaintiff Dominique Dickerson by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/17/13. (dkals, )
February 26, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/26/13. (cbssec)
February 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Intervene by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/14/13.(dkals, )
December 11, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 2/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/11/12. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camara et al v. Matheson Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahamet Camara
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moussa Dembele
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre De Oliveira
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bemba Diallo
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salif Diallo
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macire Diarra
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Dickerson
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Duke
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Kaba
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Patricelli
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Williams
Represented By: Lynn D. Feiger
Represented By: Stephen E. Kapnik
Represented By: Brian Thomas Moore
Represented By: Justin Michael Plaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?