PostNet International Franchise Corporation v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: PostNet International Franchise Corporation
Defendant: Arthur Jones and Carolyn Jones
Case Number: 1:2012cv03065
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR CONTEMPT SANCTIONS re: 19 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, it is ORDERED that: defendants SHALL MAKE NO FURTHER USE OR DISPLAY of the Property at the Premises and SHALL PERMANENTLY REMOVE the Property from the Premises by June 1, 2014; If defendants fail to permanently remove the Property from the Premises by June 1, 2014, defendants SHALL FORFEIT ALL RIGHTS to the Property and PostNet shall be entitled to seize and remove any and all of the Property from the Premises with the assistance of the United States Marshal; If any persons other than defendants claim an interest in any part of the Property, the defendants SHALL IDENTIFY such persons, including contact information, to PostNet; and, Upon seizing and removing the Property from the Premises, PostNet and the United States Marshal are AUTHORIZED TO TAKE, STORE, DESTROY, TRANSFER, OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF the Property in any manner they deem fit. PostNet and the United States Marshal may maintain custody of the Property but are not obligated to do so and the Property may be transferred or destroyed upon seizure and removal from the Premises. PostNet and the United States Marshal shall not be held liable for the loss of or damage to any of the Property. The Court reserves the right to impose any additional sanctions necessary to address the defendants violations of this Courts Orders, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/16/2014. (evana, )
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. ORDERED that the defendants shall fully comply with my September 30, 2013, Order 19 on or before Monday, February 10, 2014. ORDERED that PostNet shall mail to the defendants, via overnight delivery, my September 30, 2013, Order 19 and a ll subsequent Minute Orders and Orders that relate to said Order 19 . PostNet shall mail such Minute Orders and Orders by Thursday, January 9, 2014. PostNet shall file a Status Report on or before Friday, February 21, 2014, apprising the Court wh ether the defendants have fully complied with my September 30, 2013, Order 19 . The defendants are on notice that failure to comply with this Order will subject them to the full extent of civil contempt sanctions I am authorized to impose in order to ensure compliance with my previous Orders by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/08/14. (jjhsl, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. ORDERED that a hearing is set for Tuesday, January 7, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. (MST), 2:30 p.m. (PST), in Courtroom A-1002. Defendant, Arthur Jones, shall appear via telephone and my Courtroom Deputy, Robb Keech, will contact Jones immediately prior to the hearing. The scope of this hearing is limited to the exact and precise civil contempt sanctions I will impose against the Defendants to ensure compliance with my September 30, 2013, Order 19 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/13. (jjhsl, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion To Present Telephonic Testimony by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/18/13.(jjhsl, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Default Judgment. SEE order for detailed information. ORDERED that PostNet shall file a Status Report on or before Monday, October 21, 2013, apprising the Court whether the Defendants have fully complied with the terms of this Order. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/2013.(trlee, )
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 2/7/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/29/12. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PostNet International Franchise Corporation v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PostNet International Franchise Corporation
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?