Ruiz v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Ruiz
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv03097
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to pay his or its own attorney's fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/18/13. (jjhsl, )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend January 9, 2013 Minute Order (Doc. 11). Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss due by 3/10/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/16/13.(bnbcd, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/29/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/06/12. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Represented By: John D. Keen
Represented By: Emma Jane Skivington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ruiz
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?