FreshPack Produce, Inc., v. VM Wellington LLC, et al.,
Plaintiff: |
FreshPack Produce, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Alan Carman, Savoy Income Fund I LP, Samuel J. Mancini, Ronald S. Allen, VM Wellington LLC, VM Operations LLC and Village Markets Holding Ltd., LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv03157 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2012 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Martinez |
Nature of Suit: |
Agriculture Acts |
Cause of Action: |
07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/26/2014. (trlee, )
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing
59
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/4/2013. (mjwcd)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER Plaintiffs request for preliminary injunctive relief ECF No. 1 is GRANTED with respect to named-Defendants below. The Court therefore ORDERS as follows: Defendants (1) VM Operations LLC, (2) Village Markets Holding Ltd., LLC, (3) Savoy Incom e Fund I LP, (4) Samuel J. Mancini, and (5) Ronald S. Allen, and their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and financial institutions, are all hereby restrained from dissipating and/or disbursing any and all trust funds, monies, and/or liquidated interests of any type whatsoever now in their possession or under their control that are generated by or resulting from the sale of perishable agricultural commodities, as well as any and all trust funds and/or monies hereafter received, except for payment in full to Plaintiffs counsel, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/3/2013. (ervsl, )
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER Extending the Terms of the Court's Temporary Restraining Order. The Temporary Restraining Order entered by the Court on December 6, 2012 (ECF No. 19 ) shall remain in full force and effect through 11:59 p.m. on Thursday, January 3, 201 3; and Not later than December 28, 2012, the parties shall file the following: (a) Contemporaneous Statement of Facts addressing which entities related to the Defendants are currently involved in bankruptcy proceedings; whether any Defendants are t hemselves currently in bankruptcy court, and a detailed description of the day-to-day operational role the entities currently in bankruptcy court had in the business and operations of the named Defendants; (b) Contemporaneous briefs, not to exceed 5 pages exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service, addressing the issue of whether any of the related corporate entities currently in bankruptcy court are subject to the statutory provisions of PACA. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/20/12. (alvsl)
|
December 6, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. A hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on December 20, 2012 at 3:00 p.m., Courtroom A801 of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294, at which time Defendants shall appear and show cause as to why Plaintiffs request for preliminary injunction should not be granted, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/6/2012.(ervsl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?