Dmytryszyn v. Clements et al

Plaintiff: Adam Dmytryszyn
Defendant: Tom Clements, Bernadette Scott, T. Scott, Magelson, Bilderava, Bolt and James Falk
Case Number: 1:2012cv03241
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff by Clerk on 1/28/2016. (vbarn)
December 11, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE. The Order Dismissing the Case (Doc. # 110 ) and the Final Judgment (Doc. # 111 ) are VACATED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2015. (athom, )
December 3, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff re: 110 Order by Clerk on 12/3/2015. (vbarn)
November 11, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution 80 and AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 106 . SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/11/2015. (cmalc3)
September 9, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Payment or To Show Cause re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Failure to Pay the Filing Fee filed by Bernadette Scott, Bolt, Magelson, Stephen Ladd, Bilderava, James Falk, T. Scott, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/09/15. (nmarb, )
June 18, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/18/15 granting 97 Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitations by Five Pages. The Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants are granted leave to file 5 excess pages in their Motion for Summary Judgment 98 . (bsimm, )
May 21, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/21/15 re: Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to File a Response 91 . The Motion is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiff shall have up to and including 6/2/2015 to file a surreply in opposition to Defendants' pending motion to dismiss 80 , should the court not issue an order or recommendation on the underlying motion to dismiss on or before that date. (bsimm, )
April 29, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; denying 72 Motion for Review. Defendants are directed to supplement their discovery responses consistent with the direction in this Order no later than May 13, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/29/2015. (athom, )
January 21, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/21/15 re: Motion for Additional Discovery 65 . The Motion is GRANTED. Discovery due by 3/20/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2015. The Pretrial Conference set for May 20, 2015, is VACATED, and the deadline to prepare and submit the proposed pretrial order is also vacated. (bsimm, )
July 15, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 55 MAY 6, 2014RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs objection (Doc. # 56 ) is OVERRULED. Claims one, three, and four are dismissed without prejudice. The only remaining claim is claim two. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/15/2014. (athom, )
November 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/7/13. Defendant Jerri Macintosh is dismissed. (dkals, )
June 26, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/26/2013. (skl)
December 17, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 4 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/17/12.(mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dmytryszyn v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Dmytryszyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilderava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?