Wright v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gary A. Wright
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv03268
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 145 Order. Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2014. (athom, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2013. ORDERED: 71 Trans Union LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED: Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2014 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2013. 50 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is granted to the extent that the court will allow the parties to conduct the two depositions as discussed on the record out of time. In all other respects, the Motion is denied. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/9/13. ORDERED that parties MUST fully comply with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2, specifically those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal. (cbssec)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 7/2/2013. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is to supplement their responses to Plaintiff's Interrog atories by Friday, July 5, 2013. A protective order should be in place by Friday, July 5, 2013. The documents listed in the protective order should be produced to Plaintiff by Monday, July 12, 2013. 37 Motion to Compel Discovery is terminated. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss Party: Equifax Information Services, LLC is dismissed with prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/10/13.(dkals, )
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2013. 28] Plaintiffs MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order (Doc. 27) is GRANTED. Discovery due by 9/2/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402 - Courtni Covington. (ccovi)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 2/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/14/13. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rana Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary A. Wright
Represented By: Peter R. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?