Faircloth v. Timme et al

Plaintiff: James Faircloth
Defendant: Rae Timme, Rae (I) Timme, Gary Morgan, Gary (I) Morgan, Bernes, (I) Bernes, Garcia, (I) Garcia, Marquez and (I) Marquez
Case Number: 1:2012cv03317
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 180 Motion for Court Docket To Be Sent toPlaintiff By Clerk and Striking 181 Motion for Declarationof Status of Case. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/13/2016.(cmira)
April 11, 2016 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 177 Notice of Completion of Limited Appearance filed by James Faircloth is Stricken. If Ms. Owen intends to withdraw her appearance, she must complywith the requirements and procedures outlined in the rules. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/11/2016. (cmira)
March 17, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 172 Plaintiff's Motion To Alter, Amend &Vacate Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 59(e). Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/17/2016.(cmira)
January 26, 2016 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Bernes, DeWolffe, DeWolffe (I), Garcia, Holcomb, Holcomb (I), Jurado, Jurado (I), Marquez, Marquez (I), Miller, Miller (I), State of Colorado, Viola, Viola (I), (I) Bernes, (I) Garcia, (I) Marquez, Amy Cosner, Amy (I) C osner, Anthony DeCesaro, Anthony (I) DeCesaro, Dave Tessier, Dave (I) Tessier, Gary Morgan, Gary (I) Morgan, Jacqueline McCall, Jacqueline (I) McCall, Joseph Giganti, Joseph (I) Giganti, Julie Russell, Julie (I) Russell, Lance Micklich, Lance (I) Micklich, Linda Worthen, Linda (I) Worthen, Rae Timme, Rae (I) Timme, Tom Beneze, Tom Beneze (I), Tom (I) Benezee against James Faircloth re: 168 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. By Clerk on 1/26/16. (kfinn)
November 19, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER LIFTING STAY 157 AND DIRECTING SUBMISSION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/19/2015. (mlace, )
November 18, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY 157 AND DIRECTING SUBMISSION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/18/2015. (mlace, )
September 3, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 150 Motion for Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation Pursuant to D.COLO.LAttyR 2(a) is GRANTED. The Notice of Limited Representation Entry of Appearance of Elisabeth L. Owen [#150-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. [To the extent the Status Report 151 requests an extension of the stay in this case, it is GRANTED. The stay entered in this case is extended through November 27, 2015. If a Notice of Settlement or dismissal papers have not bee n filed by that date, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on or before November 27, 2015 informing the Court of the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail the August 18, 2015 Order [#148] to Plaintiff with this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/3/15.(morti, )
August 18, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/18/15. Motion for Order of Injunction and T.R.O. to Defendant'(s)to [sic] Not Impede Access to the Court(s) and/or Combined Motion for Counsel in the Alternative # 145 is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
July 30, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 130 Motion for Summary Judgment and Adopting Report and Recommendations re 135 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/30/2015.(mlace, )
June 25, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/25/15. Motion for Leave to Supplement Pleadings to Add Above Parties to Case No. 12cv3317 REB KLM # 136 , 1 Plaintiff's Petition for T.R.O. and Injunction-[R]estoring Petitioner to Status Quo and Immediate Relief to Protect Constitutional Rights # 137 , Plaintiff's Supplement Pleadings With New Claims In Relation to Current Case 12cv3317 REB KLM; Includes Pleadings # 138 and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Good Cause # 140 are DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner's Motion for Stay, or Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Motion for SummaryJudgement [sic] # 139 is DENIED as moot. (lgale, )
June 24, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 132 Petition for Extension of Time for Discovery and/or Request for Stay of Proceedings to Consult with Attorney is GRANTED. This case is STAYED through 8/30/15. For docket management purposed, the following motions are denied without prej udice: 96 Motion to Compel Discovery of Videotape inPossession of the CDOC Executive Director and His Records Keeping Personnel at CDOC in Support of Subpoena Duces Tecum and 104 Motion for Stay of the Proceedings and Request for Status Confe rence and Injunctive Relief Against CDOC and Employees. On or before 8/30/2015, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report informing the Court: (1) whether he has obtained representation and (2)whether he intends to move forward with this lawsuit. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/24/15.(morti, )
June 10, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/10/15: A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set for 2/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. A Jury Trial is set for 2/22/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dkals, )
March 19, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 3-Day Jury Trial set for 10/26/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/2015. (alowe)
April 2, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 78 Objections to Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/2/2014. (klyon, )
March 28, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 66 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 66 ], filed February 28, 2014, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART and respectfully REJECTED IN PART. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint[# 34 ], filed June 12, 2013, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/28/2014.(klyon, )
March 25, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 69 Objections to and Adopting 65 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Petition for Leave To File Amended Complaint [# 60 ], filed December 13, 2103, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/2014.(klyon, )
June 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Petition for Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/10/13.(mnfsl, )
March 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that claims two, four, six, eight, ten, twelve, fourteen, sixteen, eighteen, twenty through twenty-seven, and thirty-one in the revised second amend ed Prisoner Complaint 20 are dismissed. Defendants Case Manger Jurado, Case Manager Holcomb, Dave Tessier, Mr. DeWolffe, Julie Russell, Amy Cosner, Anthony DeCesaro, and Major Lance Micklich are dismissed as parties to this action. This case shall be assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/27/13. (sgrim)
March 21, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/21/13 GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension of Time ;and DENYING 18 Motion for Copies. (nmmsl, )
December 27, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faircloth v. Timme et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Faircloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae Timme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae (I) Timme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary (I) Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Bernes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?