Gandy v. Clements et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Gandy
Defendant: Tom Clements, Angel Medina, Steve Hartley, Jerry Barber, Steve Smith and Rick Martinez
Case Number: 1:2012cv03331
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION AND ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/4/14.(dkals, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 100 Plaintiff's [ Motion] Petition for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/12/2014.(emill)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Opinion and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motions to Dismiss. The Court ADOPTS IN PART 56 Recommendation and grants in part and denies in part Mr. Hartley and Mr. Martinez's 25 Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment. The Court ADOPTS the 68 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation as to Mr. Raemisch and GRANTS Mr. Raemisch's 63 Motion to Dismiss. There being no claims remaining against Mr. Hartley or Mr. Raemisch, the caption of this case is DEEMED AMENDED to omit reference to them. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/31/2014.(klyon, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting 76 Plaintiff's Request for Order of Protection and denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/2014.(klyon, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion to Order Clerk of Court to ServeDefendants Barber and Clements Pursuant to Red. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). The Clerk is directed to serve defendant Rick Raemisch and defendant Jerry Barber at the Colorado Department of Corrections. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/16/2013. (klyon, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/28/2013 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2013. (mjwcd)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/15/2013. (skl)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/22/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gandy v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?