Dedmon v. Chelsea Food Services et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn Dedmon
Defendant: Continental Airlines, Inc., United Air Lines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2016 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion in Limine; denying 133 Motion in Limine, by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/08/2016.(cthom, )
August 11, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion to Exclude. Plaintiffs anticipated expert testimony from Anne Stodola is EXCLUDED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/11/2015.(cthom, )
August 5, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion to Strike ; denying 93 Motion for Order. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8-5-2015. (nywlc2.)
July 31, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Deem Admitted Unanswered Requests for Admission 93 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sixth and Seventh Supplemental Disclosures 92 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
July 7, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/7/15 re: Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for Order to Deem Admitted Unanswered Requests for Admissions 109 and Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in S upport of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sixth and Seventh Supplemental Disclosures 110 . The Motions are GRANTED. Defendants have up to and including 7/17/2015 to file reply briefs. The court will entertain oral argument on the motions on 7/31/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
July 1, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/1/15 re: Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for Order to Deem Admitted Unanswered Requests for Admissions 104 , and Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sixth and Seventh Supplemental Disclosures 106 . The Motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (bsimm, )
April 14, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants' 82 Motion to Enforce is GRANTED. Defendants' 88 Motion for Leave is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/14/2015. (alowe)
March 18, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re: briefing schedule for 82 MOTION to Enforce Scheduling Order and Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by United Air Lines Inc, United Continental Holdings Inc, and Continental Airlines Inc. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3-17-15. (nywlc2).
March 6, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Strike. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3-6-15. (nywlc2)
February 26, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures 62 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiff shall file a revised exhibit list on or before 3/2/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
February 12, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ; and This case remains set for trial beginning September 28, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom A801 with a Final Trial Preparation Conference set for 2:30 p.m. on September 4, 2015, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/12/2015.(evana, )
April 3, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/3/14. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Response to Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum to Jeffrey Sabin, M.D. 36 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 39 is GRANTED. The final pretrial conference set for May 22, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED and RESET to September 30, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401. (bsimm)
February 18, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/14. (Simmons, B.)
November 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 the parties Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/19/2013.(ervsl, )
August 1, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/11/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/14/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/1/13.(bnbcd, )
January 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/4/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/17/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dedmon v. Chelsea Food Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dedmon
Represented By: Christopher Kevin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Thomas Eilif Miller Werge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Thomas Eilif Miller Werge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Eilif Miller Werge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?