Prochnow et al v. Fidelity Mortgage Company, Inc

Defendant: Fidelity Mortgage Company, Inc
Plaintiff: Jared Prochnow and Matthew Foster
Case Number: 1:2013cv00036
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion to Dismiss 7 is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/27/2013.(cmacd)
April 10, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting 19 Report and Recommendations. 11 Motion to Remand is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/10/13.(dkals, )
April 23, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. On or before 5/24/2013, Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with this Order. Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/23/13.(mnfsl, )
September 25, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court AFFIRMS and ADOPTS the 30 Recommendation, OVERRULES Defendant's objection, and GRANTS 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiffs' RICO claim and REMANDS Plaintiffs' state-law fraud claim. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/25/2014.(alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prochnow et al v. Fidelity Mortgage Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Mortgage Company, Inc
Represented By: Eric Raymond Coakley
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Prochnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.