Hamilton v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: Robert S. Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2013cv00051
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: pursuant to the court-approved stipulation of the parties, each party shall pay its attorney fees and costs; and the court retains jurisdiction of this action as may be necessary to implement the Answers of Interrogatories in the foregoing verdict forms. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/8/16. (kfinn)
January 13, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 and D.C.COLO.LCivR 56.1 and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 78 , filed November 10, 2015, is denied, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/13/2016.(evana, )
October 28, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and to Compel the Depositions of David Smith and Orlando Visbal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 71 is DENIED, for reasons stated on record. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to November 10, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
September 24, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; 68 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: The motion is GRANTED and the number of depositions each party may take is increased from ten to fifteen; The motion is GRANTED and the discove ry cutoff date is reset from October 2, 2015 to October 16, 2015; and The motion is DENIED as to the requested extension of the dispositive motion deadline. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before November 2, 2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/15.(morti, )
August 4, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge Tafoya's July 7, 2015 Order 58 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/4/2015. (mlace, )
July 7, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(c)(1) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 45 is DENIED. Plaintiff is required to respond to Defendants discovery requests, limited to tax years 2003 through 2006, as discussed. Plaintiff shall produce the documents to Defendant on or before August 21, 2015. The following deadlines are extended: Discovery Cut off October 2, 2015; Dispositive Motions November 2, 2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
April 28, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 3-Day Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/12/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/28/2015. (alowe)
June 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference and Trial Date. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set June 27, 2014, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence July 28, 2014, is VACATED. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 21, 2014. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/23/2014.(klyon, )
December 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion To Amend Trial PreparationConference Order. The Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set 1/24/2014, and the jury trial set to commence 2/10/2014, are VACATED and areCONTINUED pending further order of court. On 12/17/2013, commencing at 10:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference to reset the Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference and jury trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/4/2013.(klyon, )
April 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparsation Conference set for 1/24/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/11/13. (rebsec, )
January 16, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/16/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Hamilton
Represented By: Larry D. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?