Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00093
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/05/2014. (athom, )
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Stay. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/22/2014. (athom, )
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 92 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/2/2014. (shart)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying as moot 46 Motion to Exclude, granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 75 Motion for Leave, denying 77 Motion to Strike, granting 88 Motion for Leave, and denying as moot 91 Motion for Order. Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial are vacated. This case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/30/2014.(athom, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/13. (dkals, )
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Enforce Compliance with Court Order and To Transfer Venue by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/21/13.(dkals, )
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 defendant's Motion to Vacate and Reset the March 14, 2013 Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 3/14/2013 11:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/7/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to file proposed Scheduling Order 5/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/2013.(mjwcd)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 3/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/18/13. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?