Cellport Systems, Inc. v. HTC Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Defendant: HTC Corporation,, HTC America Holding Inc. and HTC America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00173
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/8/14.(jdyne, )
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO STAY ALL DEADLINES THROUGH FEBRUARY 28, 2014. Dismissal Paper due by 2/28/2014. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/28/14. (rbjcd, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re Claim Construction. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/7/14. (rbjcd, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/12/2012. (rbjsec )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellport Systems, Inc. v. HTC Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Compton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Prebeg
Represented By: David M. Tenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation,
Represented By: Jerry R. Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Holding Inc.
Represented By: Jerry R. Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry R. Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?