Weller et al v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Weller, Gladys Wooden and Matt Wooden
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Assurant, Inc. and American Security Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00185
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 164 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Case Service Awards and Memorandum in Support Thereof. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/2015.(mlace, )
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 163 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, Approval of Plan of Allocation and Memorandum in Support Thereof, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/2015. (ebuch)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS: The 157 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice is approved. The claims asserted on behalf of plaintiff Jack Weller, only against those defendants who have appeared in this action, HSBC Finance Corporation; HSBC Mortgage Services Inc; HSBC Bank USA NA; HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA); HSBC Consumer Lending (USA) Inc; Beneficial Company LLC; Beneficial Financial I Inc; HFC Company LLC, Assurant Inc; American Security Insurance Company; Standard Guaranty I nsurance Company; and Voyager Indemnity Insurance Company are dismissed with prejudice. The claims asserted on behalf of plaintiff Jack Weller, only, against the unnamed John Does 1-10 are dismissed with prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/6/2015. (alowe)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/20/2015. (alowe)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying the Motion by Defendants Assurant, Inc. and American SecurityInsurance Company To Dismiss the Class Action Complaint [# 31 ], filed April5, 2013; the Motion of Defendant HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. To Dismiss TheComplaint [# 33 ], file d April 5, 2013; the Motion To Certify Determinative Question of Virginia Law By Defendants Assurant, Inc. and American Security Insurance Company [# 61 ], filed June 11, 2013; and Defendants Assurant, Inc. and American Security Insurance Company's Motion To Dismiss Nationwide Class Allegations in Connection With Counts II and VI [# 99 ], filed November 15, 2013. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/2014. (klyon, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER granting 110 Joint Motion to Stay the Proceedings Pending Mediation. Status Report due by 2/19/2014, and every thirty days thereafter. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/15/2014.(mjwcd)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER granting 101 Stipulated Motion to Revise Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 30 ) is amended so as to incorporate the proposed deadlines set forth on page 6 of the subject motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/20/2013.(klyon, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Unopposed Motion for Leave to FileSupplemental Authority in Further Support of their Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint. The court will consider thesupplemental authority (Docket No. 93-1) in connection with the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 31 & 33 ). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/17/2013.(klyon, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE ORDER granting 89 Unopposed Motion for Leave to FileSupplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss. The court will consider the supplemental authority (Docket No. 89-1) in connection withthe pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 33 ). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/16/2013.(klyon, )
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Confidentiality ORDER (Docket No. 83 -1). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/12/2013. (klyon, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: Motions to Compel Arbitration. The Motion of Defendant HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. To Compel Arbitration and Stay Action as to Plaintiff Jack Weller's Claims [# 53 ] is granted. Defendants Assurant, Inc. and American Security Insuranc e Company's Motion To Compel Arbitration and To Stay Proceedings [# 60 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The claims of plaintiff, Jack Weller against defendants, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.; Assurant, Inc.; and American Security Insuranc e Company, are STAYED pending outcome of the arbitration. On or before 10/7/2013 and every 90 days thereafter,until the arbitration is completed, plaintiff, Jack Weller, and defendants, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.; Assurant, Inc.; and American Security Insurance Company, SHALL FILE a status report indicating the status of the arbitration, including but not limited to, its anticipated date of its completion. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/2013.(klyon, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Stipulated Motion to Revise Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 30 ) is amended so as to incorporate the proposed deadlines set forth on page 6 of the subject motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/13.(mjgsl, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Stipulated Motion To Revise Motion To Compel Briefing Schedule. The motion is granted in part to the extent that plaintiff may have until 6/21/2013, in which to file a response. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/2013. (klyon, )
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Stipulated Motion to Revise SchedulingOrder. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 30 ) is amended so as to incorporate the proposed deadlines set forth on pages 3 and 4 of the subject motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/30/2013.(klyon, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Stipulated Motion To Vacate Dates For Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/27/2013, and the jury trial set to commence 10/21/2013, are VACATED and are CONTINUED pending further order of court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/29/2013.(klyon, )
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2013.Denying without prejudice 42 plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Revise Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Stipulated Motion to Amend Case Management Scheduling Order for Class Certification to Extend Deadline for Expert Disclosures. Scheduling Order for Class Certification 30 is amended as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2013.(mjwcd)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2013. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/27/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 10/21/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/13. (rebsec, )(Entered: 3/22/13)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/2013. (klyon, )
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 3/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2013. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller et al v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Weller
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Wooden
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Wooden
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?