Hebert v. Clements et al

Plaintiff: Hal Lewis Hebert
Defendant: Tom Clements, James Falk, Michelle Nycz, Robert Keisel and Chase Felzien
Case Number: 1:2013cv00259
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Chase Felzien, John Chapdelaine, Michelle Nycz, Rick Raemisch, Robert Keisel against Hal Lewis Hebert by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/22/15. (rkeec)
November 23, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Final Pre-trial Order, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/23/2015. (cthom, )
October 13, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/13/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Restrict Access to Exhibits Pursuant to Protective Order 109 is DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile. The Final Pretrial Order 110 is approved and filed with the corrections made of record. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
April 27, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/27/15 granting 77 Unopposed Motion to Conduct Deposition of Incarcerated Inmate Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(a)(2)(B). (bsimm, )
January 21, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/21/15 re: Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 73 . The Motion is GRANTED. Discovery due by 5/22/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2015. The Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2015 is vacated and reset to 9/23/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2015. (bsimm, )
November 12, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 70 the Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions. Discovery due by 1/23/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference set for March 19, 2015, is vacated and reset. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/19/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/2014.(evana, )
October 24, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/24/14. (bsimm, )
June 12, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/14 re: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Reset Final Pretrial Conference Date 57 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Discovery due by 10/20/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm)
May 20, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 51 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiffs Motion in Request of Emergency Preliminary Injunction ECF No. 45 is DENIED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/20/2014.(evana, )
November 19, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 28 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 16 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Plaintiffs Claims against the Defendants in their official capacities for retroactive monetary relief are DISMISSED based on Eleventh Amendment immunity; and All other claims remaining pending in this case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/19/2013.(ervsl, )
May 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 20 the Motion to Stay Proceeding as to an extension to respond. Plaintiff has to and including June 28, 2013, in which to respond to the defendants Motion to Dismiss 16 , by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/13/2013.(ervsl, )
February 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/21/2013. (skl)
February 1, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/1/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal Lewis Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Nycz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Keisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Felzien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?