Lassiter v. Pinnacle Financial Group Incorporated
Plaintiff: Phebe Lassiter
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2013cv00268
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. ORDERED that the parties' Stipulated Motion For Entry Of Judgment In Favor Of The Plaintiff And Against The Defendant [Docket No. 97] is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff shall be awarded thirty thousand dollars ($30,000.00), which amount is inclusive of plaintiff's costs and reasonable attorney's fees. ORDERED that plaintiff Phebe Lassiter's Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses [Docket No. 79] and defendant Integrity Solution Services, Inc.'s Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs [Docket No. 85] are each DENIED as moot. ORDERED that the Bill of Costs filed by the Clerk of the Court [Docket No. 84] is VACATED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/04/14. (jhawk, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 93 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 9/29/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. If Plaintiff wishes to have a record of the Examination, she shall bring her own court reporter. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/29/2014.(emill)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: $150.00 in damages pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(2)(A) areawarded against defendant Integrity Solution Services, Inc. and in favor of plaintiff Phebe Lassiter. This case is CLOSED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/15/2014. (klyon, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/18/14.(jhawk, )
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Three-day Jury Trial set for 4/8/2014 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/24/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/31/13. (mnfsl, )
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date to 8/23/13 and Dispositive Motion Deadline to 9/6/2013. Discovery, for the sole purpose of deposing defendant's 30(b)(6) designee, due by 8/23/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2013. Scheduling Order 18 is amended By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/22/2013.(mjwcd)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Correct the Name of the Defendant and the Case Caption. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/15/2013. (mjwcd)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2013. (mjwcd)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/13. (mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassiter v. Pinnacle Financial Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Group Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph J. Lico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phebe Lassiter
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?