Small v. Trani, et al
Plaintiff: Tyron Duante Small
Defendant: Candace Crosley, Kevin Crutcher and Bryan Roberts
Interested_party: Case Manager or Inmate Coordinator for Tyron Duante Small
Case Number: 1:2013cv00292
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 152 Joint Stipulated Motion To Dismiss with Prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/28/2015.(mlace, )
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/21/15. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/30/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn and a Jury Trial is set for 11/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dkals, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER granting 142 defendants' Motion to Vacate and Reset the May 6, 2015 Settlement Conference Due to Death in the Family. Settlement Conference 5/6/2015 02:00 PM is vacated. Settlement Conference reset for 6/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/28/2015.(emill)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER granting 138 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Order Permitting Him to Appear Telephonically for March 30, 2015 Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/27/2015. (emill)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER granting 135 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear at the March 30, 2015 Status Conference Telephonically, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/24/2015.(emill)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER granting 132 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset the March 17, 2015 Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/04/2015. Status Conference set for 3/17/2015 is VACATED and RESET on 3/30/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER ADOPTING 111 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's 109 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/27/2015. (alowe)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER denying 113 Motion Request From this Court to Make Defendants to Respond; granting 114 Plaintiff Factual Copy Motions Request Motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/11/2014.(slibi, )
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER denying 103 Motion to Expedite and granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion for Order for copies, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment and adopting Report and Recommendations 89 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/11/2014.(trlee, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's "Damages Being Seeked [sic], andSettlement Dispute Resolution hearing" (Docket No. 93 ) and "Request for an [sic] Jury Trial in the current case" (Docket No. 94 ) are both denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/18/2014.(klyon, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Statis [sic] Update onSummery [sic] Judgment (Docket No. 86 ) is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is advised that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 75 ) is still pending, and a report and recommendation on that motion (Docket No. 75) will be issued in due course. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/27/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER denying 82 Motion Requesting that the Defendants [sic] Summary Judgment be Stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/2014.(klyon, )
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER denying 69 Plaintiffs Motion Requesting an AlternativeDispute Resolution Hearing; denying 70 Motion Requesting That There Be An [sic]Trial Date Set In a Motion; and denying 72 Motion Requesting an Objection to theDefendants Possible File for Time Extentsion [sic]. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/2014.(klyon, )
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER denying 41 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's motion captioned"Disclosure Correction Motion". By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2013.(klyon, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 5/9/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/5/2013. (mjwcd)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case. ORDERED that Defendant Warden Trani is dismissed as a party to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to District Judge Robert E. Blackburn and to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/1/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. Trani, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyron Duante Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Crosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Crutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Case Manager or Inmate Coordinator for Tyron Duante Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?