Miller et al v. Timothy M. Buchheit Revocable Trust et al
Plaintiff: Frances Ellen Miller and Douglas E. Miller
Defendant: Jon F. Buchheit Revocable Trust, Kate Ann Louise Buchheit Revocable Trust, Jeffery J. Buchheit Revocable Trust, Amy Buchheit McCabe Revocable Trust, Kristi A. Hahs Revocable Trust, Nicholas J. Buchheit Revocable Trust, Joe Bullock, Jeffrey Unterreiner, CPA, Timothy M. Buchheit Revocable Trust, Ronald C. Unterreiner, Robert E. Moser, Herbert Graetz, Begley Young Unterreiner & White, LLC and Douglas P. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Case Number: 1:2013cv00365
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Amended Recommendations on Pending Motions [# 73 ] are APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The objections of plaintiffs in their Objection to Amended Recommendations on Pending Motions [# 81 ] are OVERRULED. The Motion To Dismiss, Stay or Transfer on Behalf of Defendants Ronald C. Unterreiner, Herbert Graetz, Robert E. Moser, Joe Bullock, Jeffrey Unterreiner, CPA, and Begley Young Unterreiner & White LLC [# 32 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. Pursuant to defendants' Notice To Withdraw Motion To DismissSecond Amended Complaint [# 67 ] and the court's corresponding order granting that motion [# 74 ] defendants' Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint [# 54 ] is WITHDRAWN. All pretrial deadlines, the Trial Preparation Conference set 3/28/2014, at 3:30 p.m., and the jury trial set to commence 4/14/2014, are VACATED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for theEastern District of Missouri (111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, MO 63102). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/22/2013. (klyon, )
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/10/2013. 30 Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendants Ronald C. Unterreiner, Herbert Graetz, Robert E. Moser, Joe Bullock, Jeffrey Unterreiner, CPA, and Begley Young Unterreiner & White LLC is DENIED as moot. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Joe Bullock, Only. The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice [# 51 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims against defendant Joe Bullock are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant Joe Bullock is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/29/2013. (klyon, )
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/28/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 4/14/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/23/13. (rebsec, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of Dismissal as to the Buchheit Defendants. The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice [# 38 ] is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims against the Buchheit Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Buchheit Defendants, Timothy M. B uchheit Revocable Trust; Jon F. Buchheit Revocable Trust; Jeffery J. Buchheit Revocable Trust; Douglas P. Buchheit Revocable Trust; Nicholas J. Buchheit Revocable Trust; Amy Buchheit McCabe Revocable Trust; Kristi A. Has Revocable Trust; and Kate Ann Louise Buchheit Revocable Trust, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/2013. (klyon, )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER striking 32 Motion To Dismiss, Stay or Transfer onBehalf of Defendants Ronald C. Unterreiner, Herbert Graetz, Robert E. Moser, JoeBullock, Jeffrey Unterreinder, CPA and Begley Young Unterreinder & White LLC. The motion is STRICKEN for failure to comply with REB Civ. Practice Standard IV.B.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/17/2013.(klyon, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/20/13. (kfinn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Timothy M. Buchheit Revocable Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon F. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Ann Louise Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery J. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Buchheit McCabe Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi A. Hahs Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Unterreiner, CPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald C. Unterreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Graetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Begley Young Unterreiner & White, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P. Buchheit Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Ellen Miller
Represented By: Daniele William Bonifazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Miller
Represented By: Daniele William Bonifazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?