Chambers v. The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Eagle, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Stan Chambers
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Eagle, Colorado, The, Jackie Cooper, Jackie (I) Cooper, Joseph D. Hoy, Heath Mosness, Heath (I) Mosness, Tad Degen, Tad (I) Degen, Board of Education, Eagle County School District, The, Eric Mandeville, Eric (I) Mandeville, Kimberly James and Kimberly (I) James
Case Number: 1:2013cv00393
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: The parties' 128 Joint Stipulated Agreement is approved. Defendant's 127 Bill of Costs is withdrawn and each party will bear his own court costs incurred in connection with this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/7/2015. (alowe)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 125 Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Stan Chambers claims against Defendant Heath Mosness, Eagle County Deputy Sheriff, in his individual and official capacity are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Clerk on 2/27/2015. (alowe)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADOTING 118 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's 121 Objections to Recommendation and Order of United States Magistrate Judge are OVERRULLED and Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/17/2015. (alowe)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 119 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/28/2015.(alowe)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/27/2014.(alowe)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 5/1/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set 5/18/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/1/14. (rebsec)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Overruling Objections to and Adopting 76 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant Cooper's Motion To Dismiss the AmendedComplaint [# 32 ], filed July 8, 2013, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Ms. Cooper in her individual capacity are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: Objections to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 77 ], filed November 12, 2013, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART and respectfully REJECTED IN PART. The objections stated in Defendant Kimberly James' Objection to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 79 ], filed November 26, 2013, are SUSTAINED. The objections stated in Plaintiff's Objections to the Recommendation of United States Magistrat e Judge Concerning Defendant Mandeville [# 81 ], filed November 26, 2013, are OVERRULED. The School District Defendants Motion To Dismiss [# 41 ], filed July 26, 2013, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants, Eric Mandeville and Kimberly James, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/18/2014.(klyon, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Overruling 82 Objections to and Adopting 78 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Motion To Dismiss Claims Against the Board of County Commissioners of Eagle County, Colorado, Joseph D. Hoy, and Tad Degen Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(1) and (b)(6) [#43], filed July 30, 2013, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants, Joseph D. Hoy and Tad Degen, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/12/2014.(klyon, )
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Regarding Addendum to Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 70 . Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Heath Mossnes, in his official capacity only, are Dismissed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/09/13. (jjhsl, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed 65 Motion to Dismiss. The following defendants and claims are DISMISSED: Defendant The Board of Education, Eagle County School District; Defendant The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Eagle C olorado, in its official capacity; Count V of the Amended Complaint (outrageous conduct) against defendant Joseph D. Hoy, Eagle County Sheriff, in his official capacity; Count V of the Amended Complaint (outrageous conduct) against defendant Tad Dege n, in his official capacity; All claims against defendant Jackie Cooper, in her official capacity; and Count IV of the Amended Complaint ("failure to implement appropriate policies, customs and practices") against defendant Jackie Cooper, in her individual capacity. On or before 9/30/2013, the plaintiff shall file a status report as to what claims remain pending in this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/2013.(klyon, )
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting the following motions: 47 Defendant Cooper's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Determination of Absolute, Qualified, Eleventh Amendment, and Sovereign Immunities and 49 Defendants the Board of County Commissioners of Eagle County, Colorado, Joseph D. Hoy, and Tad Degen's Motion to Stay Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/12/2013. (mehcd)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 9/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/15/13. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Eagle, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Chambers
Represented By: H. Craig Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Eagle, Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie (I) Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Mosness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath (I) Mosness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad (I) Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education, Eagle County School District, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric (I) Mandeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly (I) James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?