USA v. $62,232.97 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4038009447 et al

Defendant: $2,796.60 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account # 6249808806, $340.76 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account # 8992266356, $490.15 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702084189, $100.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702116986, $600.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700789509, $2,198.38 Seized from Elevations Credit Union Account # 259658, $15,249.67 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701437681, $19,275.96 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700666156, $831,786.86 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700583218, $1,004,786.66 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701454918, $24,242.52 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700787573, $702.37 Seized from US Bank Account # 151702524431, $6,528.63 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4037230762, $62,232.97 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4038009447, $695.12 Seized from National Bank of Arizona Account # 50051578, 2011 Toyota Tacoma, VIN 3TMLU4EN6BM078859, 2013 Triumph Thunderbird ABS, VIN SMTB01TL3CJ521380, 710 Tenacity Drive, Unit 101, Longmont, Colorado and 66.51 County Road 1917, Linden, Texas
Plaintiff: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00567
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk on 9/30/2014. (trlee, )
November 22, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against $1,004,786.66 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701454918, $100.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702116986, $15,249.67 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701437681, $19,275.96 Se ized from Compass Bank Account # 6700666156, $2,198.38 Seized from Elevations Credit Union Account # 259658, $24,242.52 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700787573, $490.15 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702084189, $6,528.6 3 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4037230762, $600.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700789509, $62,232.97 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4038009447, $831,786.86 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700583218, 2013 Triumph Thunderbird ABS, VIN SMTB01TL3CJ521380, 710 Tenacity Drive, Unit 101, Longmont, Colorado re: 27 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property, by Clerk on 11/22/2013. (klyon, )
April 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT Of Entry, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/01/13.(nmmsl, ) Modified on 4/1/2013 to show correct magistrates name. (nmmsl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $62,232.97 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4038009447 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,796.60 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account # 6249808806
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $340.76 Seized from Wells Fargo Bank Account # 8992266356
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $490.15 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702084189
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $100.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6702116986
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $600.00 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700789509
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,198.38 Seized from Elevations Credit Union Account # 259658
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,249.67 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701437681
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,275.96 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700666156
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $831,786.86 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700583218
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,004,786.66 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6701454918
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,242.52 Seized from Compass Bank Account # 6700787573
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $702.37 Seized from US Bank Account # 151702524431
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,528.63 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4037230762
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $62,232.97 Seized from Vectra Bank Account # 4038009447
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $695.12 Seized from National Bank of Arizona Account # 50051578
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Toyota Tacoma, VIN 3TMLU4EN6BM078859
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Triumph Thunderbird ABS, VIN SMTB01TL3CJ521380
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 710 Tenacity Drive, Unit 101, Longmont, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 66.51 County Road 1917, Linden, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?