Cohen v. Public Service Company of Colorado d/b/a Xcel Energy

Plaintiff: Stacey Cohen
Defendant: Public Service Company of Colordo
Case Number: 1:2013cv00578
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 281 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: Trial Preparation Conference and Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2016. Denying 257 Motion in Limine. Deferring ruling on 258 Motion in Limine. Counsel shall file revised jury instr uctions and objections, with a basis for the objections, not later than Wednesday, April 20, 2016. Counsel shall file revised witness lists not later than Wednesday, April 20, 2016. Counsel shall file revised exhibit lists not later than Wednesday, April 20, 2016. Plaintiff shall file notice of withdrawal of age discrimination claim not later than Wednesday, April 20, 2016. Court Reporter: Mary George. (rkeec)
March 28, 2016 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 267 the Joint Motion to Request and Clarify that Motions in Limine Be Argued at the April 12, 2016 Final Trial Preparation Conference. Accordingly, because I will handle all remaining pretrial matters at the Final Trial Preparat ion Conference, the status conference set for March 31, 2016 is VACATED. Argument on the Motions in Limine are set for 4/12/2016 at the Final Trial Preparation Conference. The parties collectively submitted over seventy disputed instructions. This is entirely unacceptable and will not be tolerated. Accordingly, ECF Nos. 261 , 262 , 263 , 264 , 265 , and 266 are STRICKEN from the record. An entirely new set of proposed jury instructions, proposed verdict forms and related submissions shall be filed not later than Thursday, April 7, 2016, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/28/2016.(evana, )
February 18, 2016 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 247 the parties Joint Status Report Regarding Plaintiffs Production of Bank and Credit Card Statements. I order the parties to appear for a status conference on Wednesday, February 24, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Along with addressing the issues raised in the Joint Status Report, I will clarify with both parties what I will allow to be presented as evidence at the trial set for May 2, 2016, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/18/2016. (evana, )
December 3, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 192 is DENIED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/3/2015.(evana, )
October 26, 2015 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/26/15. Defendant's Motion to Strike Twelve of Plaintiff's Trial Witnesses 209 isGRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Witnesses Listed in Joint Pretrial Order 210 is D ENIED. Defendant's Motion to Compel Supplementation of Plaintiff's Document Production in Response to Request for Production #21 212 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must produce unredacted copies of statements from 11/1/2013 to 11/1/2014 no later than 11/13/2015. (bsimm, )
August 19, 2015 230 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendant's Motion to Strike Twelve of Plaintiffs Trial Witnesses 209 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs Motion to Stri ke Witnesses Listed in Joint Pretrial Order 210 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant's Motion to Compel Supplementation of Plaintiff's Document Production in Response to Request for Production #21 212 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
October 7, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 162 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of Objections to Bench Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/7/2014.(evana, )
September 5, 2014 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking 158 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Objections to Bench Ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions for failure to comply with my Practice Standards and this Courts Local Rules, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/5/2014.(evana, )
July 18, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/18/2014.(evana, )
July 10, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Motion for Sanctions Doc. # 128 is DENIED. The Motion to File Reply Doc. # 139 is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing Plaintiffs Reply Doc. # [139-1]. The Motion to Restrict Access Doc. # 142 is DENIED. A final pretrial conference is set for August 21, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than August 14, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/2014.(evana, )
July 9, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Defendant's request for attorney's fees is DENIED.FTR: Courtroom A-401. (bsimm, )
April 1, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/1/14. A supplemental final pretrial conference is set for June 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a revised proposed final pretrial order no later than June 3, 2014. The Motion to Substitute Revised Exhibit List 118 is DENIED as moot. (bsimm)
January 24, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion to Strike and granting 79 Motion for Extension by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/14. (dkals, )
November 1, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 57 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Non-Expert Discovery is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/1/13. (bnbcd, )
September 18, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Motion for Extension of Time In Which to Conduct Independent Medical Exam and Submit Expert Report is Granted by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/18/13. (jjhsl, )
June 4, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Second Amended Complaint for filing by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/04/13.(jjhsl, )
May 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/29/13. (bnbcd, )
March 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 4/23/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/15/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Public Service Company of Colorado d/b/a Xcel Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Cohen
Represented By: Barry Douglas Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of Colordo
Represented By: John Mark Baird
Represented By: Beth Ann Doherty Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?