Ensign United States Drilling Inc. et al v. B&H Rig and Tong Sales et al

Plaintiff: Ensign United States Drilling Inc. and Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc.
Defendant: B&H Rig and Tong Sales and Weatherford U.S. Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2013cv00724
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 135 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/29/2015. (ebuch)
August 6, 2015 130 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/6/2015. (ebuch)
July 27, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying 80 Defendant Weatherford's MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer. Granting 90 Defendant Weatherford's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant Weatherford on Plaintiff(s) Ensign's First Claim for Relief for Negligence and Second Claim for Relief for Strict Liability, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/27/2015. (ebuch)
July 10, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the July 10, 2015 status/scheduling hearing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/10/2015. (ebuch)
June 25, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Defendant Weatherford's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Granting 90 Defendant Weatherford's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Weatherford on Plaintiff(s) Ensign's First and Second Claims for Relief, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/25/2015. (ebuch)
February 6, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/6/14. (sgrim)
February 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/4/14.(dkals, )
October 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Defendant B&H Rig and Tong Sales is dismissed as a defendant in this case for lack of personal jurisdiction, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/30/2013. (eseam)
September 5, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/25/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/5/13. (sgrim)
July 1, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss or Stay or, in the Alternative, Transfer. Withdrawing 16 Defendant Weatherford's Motion to Dismiss or Stay, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/1/2013. (eseam)
June 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to B&H Rig and Tong Sales' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion [for] Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Over B&H Rig and Tong Sales, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/26/2013. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ensign United States Drilling Inc. et al v. B&H Rig and Tong Sales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ensign United States Drilling Inc.
Represented By: Tamir I. Goldstein
Represented By: Reed W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc.
Represented By: Tamir I. Goldstein
Represented By: Reed W. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&H Rig and Tong Sales
Represented By: Thomas Henry Blomstrom
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford U.S. Limited Partnership
Represented By: Malissa Elaine Williams
Represented By: Maureen Reidy Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?