Forte Supply, LLC et al v. Mojo Frozen Yogurt, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Forte Supply, LLC and Jeffrey Resnick
Defendant: Mojo Frozen Yogurt, LLC and Thouria Ibrahim
Case Number: 1:2013cv00797
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Motion to Administratively Close Case by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/14/2016.(cthom, )
January 5, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/5/16 granting 107 motion for extension of time to file dismissal papers. Dismissal Papers due by 1/31/2016.(bsimm, )
September 2, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/2/15 re: Stipulated Motion for Order Directing Removal of Internet Discussions of Plaintiff Pursuant to Settlement Agreement 101 . The Stipulated Motion for Order is GRANTED; The Settlement Agreemen t tendered by the Parties is APPROVED; Pursuant to Paragraph 2.3 of the Settlement Agreement, Defendants are DIRECTED to remove any and all online reviews and comments concerning Plaintiffs; Defendants are directed to serve a copy of this Order, by personal service or otherwise, on merchantcircle.com and google.com. (bsimm, )
June 3, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Motion to Vacate pre-trial conference. Dismissal Paper due by 6/30/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/3/2014.(trlee, )
September 30, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Change Venue and to Dismiss (ECF No. 17 ). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/30/13. (alvsl)
September 23, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 40 MOTION for Leave to Inspect and Test Evidence Pursuant to FRCP 34 is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/13. (bnbcd, )
July 22, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 26 MOTION for Order to Preserve Evidence is DENIED; The plaintiffs are granted leave to serve a request for inspection. 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/13. (bnbcd, )
June 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 8/19/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/4/13. (bnbcd, )
April 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/03/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forte Supply, LLC et al v. Mojo Frozen Yogurt, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forte Supply, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Resnick
Represented By: Robert A. Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojo Frozen Yogurt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thouria Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?