Hanlon et al v. Columbine Management Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Hanlon, Linda Dollar and Relators |
Defendant: |
Columbine Management Services, Inc and Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc. |
Interested_party: |
United States |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00826 |
Filed: |
April 1, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Larimer |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
119
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Defendants Columbine Management Services, Inc. And Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc.'s Motion For Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees. An amended final judgment shall enter. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/28/17. (kfinn) Modified on 3/29/2017 to change the document type to an opinion (athom, ).
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
106
AMENDED JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Columbine Management Services, Inc, Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc. against Relators, Anthony Hanlon, Linda Dollar re: 105 Clerk's Judgment. By Clerk on 3/29/16. (kfinn)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing
105
JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Columbine Management Services, Inc, Poudre Valley Health Care, Inc. against Relators, Anthony Hanlon, Linda Dollar re: 104 Order Overruling Objections and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. By Clerk on 3/28/16. (kfinn)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
86
MINUTE ORDER; 84 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/30/15.(morti, )
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER; 75 Motion to Amend Complaint and Join a Party is DENIED without prejudice., by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/15.(morti, )
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing
74
STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/4/15. (lgale, )
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
67
ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) Day Jury Trial set for 8/1/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/22/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/21/2015. (mlace, )
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
26
MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to Unrestrict Case and Maintain Level 2 Restrictions of Certain Pleadings. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall unrestrict this case and that all filings except Docket Nos. 6 and 15 shall be unrestricted and pu blically accessible. The 5 Unopposed Motion Level 2 Motion by the United States for Partial Lifting of Case Restriction is DENIED as moot. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2015 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 1/15/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling order due by 1/8/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/16/2014. (alowe) (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/17/2014 to correct the year on the hearing) (alowe).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?