Denver Urban Homesteading, LLC v. Dervaes Institute et al

Plaintiff: Denver Urban Homesteading, LLC
Defendant: Jules Dervaes, Dervaes Institute and Mignon Rubio Dervaes
Case Number: 1:2013cv00917
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Dervaes Institute, Jules Dervaes and Mignon Rubio Dervaes and against plaintff Denver Urban Homesteading, LLC re: 64 . Defendants are awarded costs, by Deborah A. Hansen, deputy clerk, on 3/28/2014. (dhans, )
March 26, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Objections to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 49 ], filed February 28, 2014, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART and respectfully REJECTED IN PART. Defendants' Motio n To Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion To Transfer Venue for Inconvenient Forum [# 13 ], filed May 28, 2013, is GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal. All currently pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All pretrial deadlines and hearings, including the Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for May 15, 2014, at 2:30 p.m., and the trial scheduled to commence on June 2, 2014, are VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/26/2014.(klyon, )
December 17, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/17/2013.(trlee, )
July 10, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/16/2014 02:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 6/2/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/13. (rebsec, )
April 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/16/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denver Urban Homesteading, LLC v. Dervaes Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jules Dervaes
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dervaes Institute
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mignon Rubio Dervaes
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Urban Homesteading, LLC
Represented By: James Bertini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?