Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.164.177.114
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.164.177.114
Case Number: 1:2013cv00998
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice ECF No. 44 is APPROVED. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/5/2014. (evana, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2014, granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2). Discovery due by 6/2/2014. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third PartySubpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/23/13.(jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.164.177.114
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.164.177.114
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?