Horton v. Fenlon et al

Plaintiff: Willie Horton
Defendant: Blake Davis, Mark Collins, P. Rangel, D. Foster and A. Fenlon
Case Number: 1:2013cv01089
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of A. Fenlon, D. Foster against Willie Horton re: 87 Order Overruling Objections to and Adopting Recommendation ofUnited States Magistrate Judge. By Clerk on 1/11/16. (kfinn)
November 19, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Order to take Judicial Notice. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/19/15.(nywlc1)
May 11, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. The 49 Judgment filed 3/24/2015 is vacated. The court's 48 Order Overruling Objections to and Adopting Recommendation of United States Mag istrate Judge is vacated in part to the extent it adopted the magistrate judge's recommendation that plaintiff's access to court claims should be dismissed as time-barred. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint, alleging a single claim for denial of access to courts as against only the defendants implicated by that claim, on or before 6/15/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/11/2015.(alowe)
March 24, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 48 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Order on Report and Recommendations. By Clerk on 3/24/15. (kfinn)
June 10, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 38 Objections to and Adopting 37 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) [#27], filed November 18, 2013, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/10/2014.(klyon, )
January 24, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 32 Motion for Clarification and denying 34 Motion for Clarification. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2014.(klyon, )
September 10, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/10/13.(nmmsl, )
August 14, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/14/2013. (skl)
May 21, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/21/13 terminating 7 Motion to Clarify. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of the Docket in Case No. 12-cv-00349-REB-BNB to Plaintiff so he can identify the document to be copied. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to comply with the Courts April 25, 2013 Order.(nmmsl, )
April 25, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/25/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Fenlon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?