Millet v. Adams County Sheriff's Office et al

Defendant: Douglas N. Darr, Douglas (I) N. Darr and Adams County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff: Marc Millet
Case Number: 1:2013cv01153
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 8/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/14/13. (dkals, )
September 12, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/12/13. Adams County Sheriff's Office and Douglas (I) N. Darr (in his individual capacity) are dismissed with prejudice. (dkals, )
September 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/17/13. (dkals, )
January 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/22/14. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millet v. Adams County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Darr
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas (I) N. Darr
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Millet
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.