Doe et al v. McAfee et al

Plaintiff: John Doe, Jane Doe, Girl Doe 1, Girl Doe 2, Boy Doe 3 and Boy Doe 4
Defendant: Joanna McAfee, Kathy Tremaine, Lisa Little, Richard Bengtsson, Jeff Greene, El Paso County Department of Human Services, Joey Harris, Jon Price, Benjamin Dearmont, Mitchell Mihalko, Terry Maketa, El Paso County Sheriff's Office, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Jonathan Hudson, Andrew Romano, Jake Shirk, Monument Police Department, Patsy Hoover, Joanna (I) McAfee, Kathy (I) Tremaine, Patsy (I) Hoover, Lisa (I) Little, Richard (I) Bengtsson, Jeff (I) Greene, Joey (I) Harris, Jon (I) Price, Benjamin (I) Dearmont, Mitchell (I) Mihalko, Terry (I) Maketa, Jonathan (I) Hudson, Andrew (I) Romano and Jake (I) Shirk
Case Number: 1:2013cv01287
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER granting 191 Defendants' Unopposed Second Motion to Amend the Amended Scheduling Order. Amended Scheduling Order 98 is amended. Discovery due by 12/29/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2016. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/30/2015.(emill)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND OVERRULING OBJECTIONS: Mr. Hudson and Mr. Romano's Motion for Attorney Fees 103 is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs shall pay Mr. Hudson and Mr. Romano's attorney fees in the amount of $19,709.00 within 30 days of this Order. The Plaintiff's Objections ( 119 , 123 , 142 ) are OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judge rulings to which they are directed (#114, 122, 132) are AFFIRMED. The Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay depositions 164 is DENIED. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/15/15.(msksec, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER Denying 136 Defendants' Motion for Independent Mental Examination Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 35. Granting 153 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs John and Jane Doe to Produce Therapy Records, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/23/2015.(emill)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER denying 149 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Directed at Magistrate Judge Watanabe Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 30.2(b), by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/3/2015. (emill)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' 130 Stipulated Motion to Seal Protected Documents is STRICKEN with directions to re-file. The motion will need to be re-filed, and the individual who files the document will need to file it as a "motion to restrict," so that it can be included in tomorrow's public posted report under D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(d). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/19/2015. (alowe)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER granting 115 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Discovery. Plaintiffs' 117 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/18/2015.(alowe) Modified text on 5/19/2015 to include additional motion (alowe).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER denying 118 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel. The parties are to brief plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order 117 in accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2015.(emill)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER granting 105 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Jane and John Doe's Attendance at a Deposition in Colorado by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/21/15.(dkals, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part the DHS/Sheriff/DA Defendants' and Board's Objections 76 and the Plaintiffs' Objections 79 , and sustains the Monument Defendants' Objections 78 . 52 Motion to Dismiss is granted, and 59 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The caption of this action is amended. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/14. (dkals, )
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting Defendant's 47 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery as to all defendants is STAYED pending resolution of the pending motions to dismiss (Docket Nos. 52 & 59 ). The parties shall file a joint statusreport within three business days of receiving a ruling on the motions to dismiss indicating what amendments to the Scheduling Order, if any, are needed. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/8/2013.(klyon, )
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion to Correct Second [sic] Amended Complaint. The Third Amended Complaint 45 is accepted for filing. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2013.(mjwcd)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/13. (msksec, )
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2013. Plaintiff's Oral Motion to file the Second Amended Complaint 32 is granted. Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed 8/13/2013. Deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond is 8/27/2013. Defendants' Joint Oral Motion to withdraw pending motions is granted. Withdrawing without prejudice 26 Motion to Dismiss. Withdrawing without pre judice 27 Motion to Dismiss. Withdrawing without prejudice 37 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery due by 6/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2014. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/22/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Docket No. 28 -1). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/2013. (klyon, )
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/22/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. McAfee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girl Doe 1
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girl Doe 2
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Doe 3
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Doe 4
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Sidebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna McAfee
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Tremaine
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Little
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bengtsson
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Greene
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Department of Human Services
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Harris
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Price
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Dearmont
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Mihalko
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Maketa
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Shirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monument Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Hoover
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna (I) McAfee
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy (I) Tremaine
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy (I) Hoover
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa (I) Little
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Bengtsson
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff (I) Greene
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey (I) Harris
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon (I) Price
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin (I) Dearmont
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell (I) Mihalko
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry (I) Maketa
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan (I) Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew (I) Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake (I) Shirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?