Allen v. Tucker et al
Plaintiff: Rodney B. Allen
Defendant: M. Tucker, Batulis, McAvoy and USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv01316
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/07/15 re: 96 Motion for Discovery. Although it has been titled and docketed as a Motion, Doc. 96, in actuality, consists of Requests for Production pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 34, Interrogatories pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 33, and Requests for Admission pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 36. Such discovery requests are directed to the Defendants and require no action on the part of the court. Text Only Entry(nmarb, )
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS: The Court OVERRULES Mr. Allen's Objections (#84), ADOPTS the July 14, 2015 Recommendation 79 , and GRANTS Ms. Alvarado's Motion to Dismiss 47 . The Court OVERRULES IN PART and SUSTAINS IN PART Mr. Allen's Objections (#87, 88, 89 ), OVERRULES IN PART and SUSTAIN IN PART Defendants' Tucker, Batulis, and McAvoy' s Objections (#86), and ADOPTS IN PART and DECLINES IN PART the July 30, 2015 Recommendation 82 . The Court GRANTS IN PART the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 58 , dismissing all claims against Defendants Santini, He ndricks, and McAvoy, and DENIES IN PART the motion, insofar as the claims against Defendants Tucker, Batulis, and Rogers will proceed. The caption of this case is amended to omit Defendants Alvarado, Santini, Hendricks, and McAvoy. Mr. Allen 's Motion to Amend 49 is DENIED without prejudice. The Court OVERRULES Mr. Allen's Objections (#90) and AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judge's August 14, 2015 Order (#85). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/15.(msksec, )
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Stay Discovery in this matter pending a ruling on the motions to dismiss 47 and 58 , by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/24/15.(nmarb, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/15/14.(dkals, )
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/2/13. (dkals, )
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/22/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Tucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?