Ortega v. Southern Colorado Clinic, P.C.
Plaintiff: Christine Ortega
Defendant: Southern Colorado Clinic, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01397
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Disability)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 32 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED, and Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant SCC and against Plaintiff Ortega on all claims. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant SCC is AWARDED it s costs, to be taxed by the clerk of the court under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Trial Preparation Conference set for August 6, 2015 and the jury trial set to commence August 24, 2015 are VACATED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/20/2015.(evana, )
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2014. ORDERED: Mr. Cordova's oral Motion to Withdraw document 31 is GRANTED. Motion for Leave to Amend Expert Witness Disclosures 31 is withdrawn. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER stipulated to by the parties and approved by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/15/2014. (cbslc1)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Claim Three of Plaintiffs Complaint 14 is GRANTED. Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 10 is DENIED AS MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/09/13.(jjhsl, )
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 8/12/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/10/13. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Southern Colorado Clinic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Colorado Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Amy L. Miletich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ortega
Represented By: Zachary D. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?