Barnes v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Ulysses Barnes
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv01427
Filed: June 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 31 by clerk on 8/12/2015. (dhans, )
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE COMMISSIONER, REMANDING TO THE COMMISIONER, AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 30 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/11/2015. (dhans, )
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 22 Order Affirming ALJ'S Denial of Benefits. The Commissioner's denial of benefits is AFFIRMED, by Deborah Hansen, Deputy Clerk on 7/3/2014. (dhans, )
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AFFIRMING ALJ's DENIAL OF BENEFITS, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/1/2014. (evana, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Barnes
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?