American Civil Constructors, Inc. v. Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Civil Constructors, Inc.
Defendant: Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01446
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mineral
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Pursuant to the 26 Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/27/2014. (eseam)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Opposed Motion to Amend the Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/23/13.(dkals, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/25/2013. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Constructors, Inc. v. Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W. Plank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron John Pratt
Represented By: Michael Brice Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?