Steele v. HealthONE of Denver, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary-Louise W. Steele
Defendant: HealthOne of Denver, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01502
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/14/2014. (jsmit)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 : Vacating the December 1, 2014, trial date and Dismissal Paper due by 9/17/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2014. (jsmit)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 12/1/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/28/2014. (jsmit)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/28/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2014, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/8/2014. (jsmit)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/2/2014.(jsmit )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Defendant's 17 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/14/2014.(jsmit)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Take Deposition After the Discovery Cut-Off: The parties may take the deposition of Dr. Beth Roland on April 18, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. MDT, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/19/2014.(jsmit)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 11 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/15/2013. (rpmcd )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/15/2013 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 10, 2013, and lead counsel present in person. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/30/2013. (rpmcd)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Amend: proposed scheduling order must be delivered in paper form directly to chambers on or before October 3, 2013, at 4:00 p.m., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2013.(rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. HealthONE of Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthOne of Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Erik Grell
Represented By: Lisa A. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary-Louise W. Steele
Represented By: Theresa Lynne Corrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?