Diaz Quezada v. Campos Salzar
Petitioner: Karla Liliana Diaz Quezada
Respondent: Eloy Fabian Campos Salzar
Case Number: 1:2013cv01519
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601 Intl Child Abduction Remedies Act (ICARA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Eloy Fabian Campos Salzar against Karla Liliana Diaz Quezada re: 28 Order Dismissing Case WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is closed. Each party shall bear his or her own costs, by Edward P., Deputy Clerk on 2/13/2014. (evana, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE The Petition ECF No. 1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b); The Clerk shall close the case and enter judgment in favor of Defendant; Each party shall bear his or her own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/7/2014. (evana, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: 1 Petition/Application, for Return of Minor Child pursuant to The Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction signed at The Hague, Netherlands on October 25, 1980 filed by Karla Liliana Diaz Quezada. An Evidentia ry Hearing on the merits of the Application is set for 11/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 801 before Judge William J. Martinez. Petitioner Karla Liliana Diaz Quezada and Respondent Eloy Fabian Campos Salazar are ORDERED to appear IN PERSON at the h earing to offer their testimony on the issues raised by the Application and the Answer. If Petitioner is unable to secure a visitors visa for the United States in time to appear in person at the November 8, 2013 hearing, the hearing will be converted to a status conference, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8-28/2013. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Quezada v. Campos Salzar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eloy Fabian Campos Salzar
Represented By: Courtney J. Leathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karla Liliana Diaz Quezada
Represented By: Vincent Nazir Rahaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?