USA v. Goldston et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: David W. Goldston, Nancy S. Goldston, W.W. Investment Group, LLC, David (I) W. Goldston and Nancy (I) S. Goldston
Case Number: 1:2013cv01565
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER approving 75 Stipulation for the Disbursement of Remaining Proceeds, filed by First Pinkston Limited Partnership. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/8/2015. (mlace, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to Real Property Identified as "Lot 2". By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/30/2015.(alowe)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Stipulation to Priority of Interests 56 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/19/14.(morti, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER of foreclosure and judicial sale, re: 36 , as outlined in the attached document. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/12/2014. (trlee, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion for Default Judgment and granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/8/2014.(trlee, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/19/14 Granting Stipulation Regarding Contingent Interest of James and Janet Senneker 30 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Janet Senneker and Defendant James Senneker are relieved from furth er participation until such time as the Court considers arguments on the disposition of the subject property. However, Defendant Janet Senneker and Defendant James Senneker shall respond to discovery requests, should any be directed to them in this case. (lgale)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/8/14 Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief 32 . Plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment of up to 35 pages. (lgale)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [#23-1] for filing as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before November 29, 2013. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/2013.(trlee, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel may appear by telephone at the Scheduling Conference on October 10, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. by dialing the Court at 303-335-2770. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/30/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Goldston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S. Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) W. Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy (I) S. Goldston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?