Jackson v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Kenny Jackson
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01593
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/17/14. (dkals, )
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/19/2013. (rmcd)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 9/23/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/27/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Represented By: Steven R. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Jackson
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?