Norris et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Jason Norris and Dorothy Norris
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01666
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice [# 39 ] filed July 14, 2014, is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/14/2014. (klyon, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/19/14. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Jury Demand and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R.7.1A 25 is GRANTED and the Amended Answer and Jury Demand [25-1] is accepted for filing. The hearing set for May 19, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED. (bsimm)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/14. (bsimm)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 8/1/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 8/18/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/9/13. (rebsec, )
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/1/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/1/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Norris
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barton
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Norris
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?