Wilder v. Federal Corrections Officers 1-10 et al
Plaintiff: Christopher James Wilder
Defendant: Federal Corrections Officers 1-10, Federal Corrections Counselors 1-3, Federal Corrections Lieutenant and Federal Correctional Asst. Wardens
Case Number: 1:2013cv01701
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/29/15. The plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration for Stay in Abeyance and Motion to Amend Complaint 94 is DENIED. (bsimm, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/14. The Motion to Stay in Abeyance 85 is DENIED. The Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint with Proposed Amendment 88 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to compliance with this order. The Clerk shall mail to the plaintiff a copy of the court's prisoner complaint form. (bsimm, )
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ACCEPTING 77 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION: The Amended Complaint [Docket No. 47 ] is dismissed without prejudice against defendant Borja for failure to prosecute. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/6/2014.(alowe)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. Ordered on or before July 8, 2014, Ms. Turner shall file with the court under Restriction Level 3 the last known address of Lieutenant Borja or, in the alternative, a notification that the BOP does not possess any address for him. Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Attorney Advisor Kaitlin Turner at the BOP Colorado Consolidated Legal Center by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/26/14. (jhawk, )
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Ordered that the Motion for Leave to Correct Complaint with Incorporated Response to Show Cause 58 is GRANTED. Ordered that the Complaint is amended to correct the last name of defendant Lieutenant Borges to Borja. Ordered that the Recomm endation to dismiss defendant Borja [Doc. #57] is WITHDRAWN. Ordered that the future, the plaintiff shall comply with orders of this court. Failure to comply may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/16/14.(jhawk, )
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. Ordered that on or before May 5, 2014, Ms. Turner shall file with the court under Restriction Level 3 the last known address of Warden Daniels or, in the alternative, a notification that the BOP does not possess any address for him. Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Attorney Advisor Kaitlin Turner at the BOP Colorado Consolidated Legal Center by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/21/14. (jhawk, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendations 45 . Plaintiff may amend his Complaint to name Charles Daniels and Lieutenant Borges as defendants. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint naming these two defendants (and not the dismissed defendants) on or before April 11, 2014. The United States Marshal is directed to serve defendants Daniels and Borges. All remaining defendants are dismissed without prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/13/14.(jhawk, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 minute ORDER granting 41 Motion for Clarification and Continuance. Plaintiff has to and including February 24, 2014, in which to respond to my Order 30 to identify by name the unidentified defendants. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2014.(klyon, )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: On or before 12/9/13, the plaintiff shall identify eachdefendant sufficiently for the court to effect service of process. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/13. (bnbcd, )
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Drawn Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/23/13. Defendant C. E. Samuels is dismissed. (dkals, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second and Final Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/03/2013. (skl)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/14/2013. (skl)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/02/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Federal Corrections Officers 1-10 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Corrections Officers 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Corrections Counselors 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Corrections Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Correctional Asst. Wardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?