Bowring v. Bonner
Plaintiff: John Boyd Bowring
Defendant: Bobby Bonner
Case Number: 1:2013cv01707
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 51 Petition to Pay Debts, Etc. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/1/2014.(klyon, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Proceed on Appeal Out-of-Time by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/13/13.The 25 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal and the 26 motion for appointment of counsel on appeal are denied. (dkals, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend Opening Brief, dismissing Plaintiff's claims, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/18/13. (dkals, )
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER overruling 10 Objection to BNB Orders of Deficiencies, and denying 11 Motion to Withdraw Complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/23/13.(dkals, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/28/13, DENYING as premature 6 Motion for Subpoena Decus Ticum, and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowring v. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boyd Bowring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?