Messick v. The Board of Education of Denver Public School District No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Michael Messick
Defendant: Bud (i) Bullard, Denver Public School District No. 1, Board of Education of Denver Public School District No. 1, The, Bud Bullard, Sharyn (i) Guhman and Sharyn Guhman
Case Number: 1:2013cv01739
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/14/14. (rbjcd, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on November 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for October 23, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/14/2013. (rbjsec. )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/09/2013. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messick v. The Board of Education of Denver Public School District No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud (i) Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public School District No. 1
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Denver Public School District No. 1, The
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharyn (i) Guhman
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharyn Guhman
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Messick
Represented By: Ryan Stuart Coward
Represented By: Reid Jason Elkus
Represented By: Scott David McLeod
Represented By: Donald C. Sisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?