McClain v. Berkebile et al
Plaintiff: Claude McClain
Defendant: Santini, FNU MNU LNU and D. Berkebile
Case Number: 1:2013cv01742
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/28/2014. Text Only Entry (shart)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Complaint is Dismissed Without Prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/25/2014. (athom, )
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER To Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. it is ORDERED that Defendants D. K. Griggs, Ms. S. Beirker, and Ms. B. Vanhua are dismissed as parties to this action because Plaintiff does not assert any clai ms against them. It is FURTHER ORDERED that claim three in the amended Prisoner Complaint ECF No. 15 is dismissed as legally frivolous. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant identified in the caption of the amended Prisoner Complaint ECF No. 15 as FNU MNU LNU, Regional Medical Director, North Central Region, Federal Bureau of Prisons, is dismissed as a party to this action because the claim against him or her is legally frivolous. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/2013. (ervsl, )
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/2013. (skl)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/29/13. (nmmsl, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/03/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain v. Berkebile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU MNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?