Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc. v. Globex Company, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc. and Steak n Shake, LLC
Defendant: Globex Company, LLC, Springfield Downs, LLC, Christopher Baerns, Larry Baerns, Kathryn Baerns and Control LLC
Counter_claimant: Larry Baerns, Springfield Downs, LLC, Control LLC, Globex Company, LLC, Kathryn Baerns and Christopher Baerns
Counter_defendant: Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc. and Steak n Shake, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01751
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 JUDGMENT. re: 120 by Clerk on 12/15/2015. (dhans, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Proposed Bill Costs 115 DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to re-filing after judgment is entered on 10/21/2015.(cthom, ) Modified to correct text on 10/22/2015 (cthom, ).
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re: 110 Status Report. Status Report due by 9/16/2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/09/2015. (athom, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/23/2015. (athom, )
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/19/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A five day jury trial is set to commence on 7/20/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/6/2014. (trlee, )
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2014. 67 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Defendants' jury demand is STRICKEN. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/24/14. (cbssec)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2013. ORDERED: 53 Unopposed Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance is DENIED as moot. ORDERED: The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a responsive pleading to Defendants' counterclaims is extended to 10/23/2013. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the extent set forth herein; The TRO issued by this Court on August 14, 2013, has expired by its own terms and is no longer of any force or effect; The parties are ORDERED to f ile with the Court, within 45 days after the posting of the surety bond described below, a report as to the compliance with the terms of this Order and any disputes which are outstanding with regards thereto; Plaintiffs are ORDERED to post a sure ty bond with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $50,000.00 in order to secure the payment of any costs and damages that may be sustained by any party found to have been wrongfully restrained or enjoined. This Order will be effective when Plaintiffs post their surety bond; and Plaintiffs may file a motion for modification of the scope or terms of the relief granted herein if circumstances develop which would justify issuance of relief presently denied herein, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/3/2013.(ervsl, )
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for TRO, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/14/2013.(rmcd)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2013 before Judge Raymond P. Moore, denying 22 Motion for TRO. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/26/2013 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/29/13. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc. v. Globex Company, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steak n Shake, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globex Company, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Downs, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Control LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Larry Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Springfield Downs, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Control LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Globex Company, LLC
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kathryn Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Christopher Baerns
Represented By: Scott Thomas Kannady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steak n Shake Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steak n Shake, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?