Cabrera v. Steven-Robert Originals, LLC

Defendant: Steven-Robert Originals, LLC
Plaintiff: Esteban Cabrera
Case Number: 1:2013cv01765
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/9/13. (msksec, )
September 4, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The is Amended Complaint (Docket No. 15 ) accepted for filing as of the date of this order. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Docket No. 7 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE since it is directed at the initial Complaint which is no longer extant. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/4/2013.(klyon, )
July 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/19/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera v. Steven-Robert Originals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven-Robert Originals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Cabrera
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?