El-Bitar et al v. Serino

Defendant: Spencer Serino
Plaintiff: Omar El-Bitar and Janet El-Bitar
Case Number: 1:2013cv01852
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion to Dismissal [sic] with Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/18/14.(dkals, )
December 19, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add a Claim for Exemplary Damages and granting 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/19/2013.(klyon, )
October 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 7/11/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 7/28/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/13. (rebsec, )
August 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 9/20/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/6/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El-Bitar et al v. Serino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Serino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar El-Bitar
Represented By: Trenton Jeffrey Ongert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet El-Bitar
Represented By: Trenton Jeffrey Ongert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?