Womack v. Berkebile et al
Plaintiff: David Lee Womack
Defendant: Lisa Gregory, Ronald Camacho, Anthony Osagie, Shon Kuta, Sean Snider, Arko, E. Alexander, Blake Davis, Tena Sudlow, Darren Foster, Patricia Rangel, David Berkebile, Charles Samuels, Jr., John Doe and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2013cv01866
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 72 Order Adopting June 18, 2014 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Judgment is entered for defendants and against the plaintiff and this case is closed. Each party shall bear his or her own attorney's fees and costs, by Deborah Hansen, Deputy Clerk, on 7/16/2014. (dhans, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Defendants Motion to Vacate Preliminary Scheduling Conference and Stay Discovery. it is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set on February 11, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and will be reset if necessary following a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss Docket No. 43 . It is further ORDERED that all discovery is stayed in this matter until further order of the court by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/27/2014.(evana, )
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPOINTMENT ORDER In accordance with Part III.C. of the U.S. District Court's Pilot Program to Implement A Civil Pro Bono Panel, the Clerk shall select, notify, and appoint counsel to represent the pro se litigant in this civil matter, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/9/2013. (mjwcd)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Status Conference set for 12/4/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FURTHER, it is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the following interested party to the manual notification for this case for continuing manual notice until further ordered: TO THE CASE MANAGER/INMATE COORDINATOR OF: David Lee Womack, #08497-007, FLORENCE ADMAX, U.S. PENITENTIARY,P.O. Box 8500 Florence, CO 81226, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/8/2013. (ervsl, )
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/6/13. Federal Bureau of Prisons, Lisa Gregory, Shon Kuta, Patricia Rangel, Charles Samuels, Jr, Sean Snider, Tena Sudlow, David Berkebile and Blake Davis terminated. (dkals, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/16/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. Berkebile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Osagie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shon Kuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tena Sudlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Samuels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?