Elam-Floyd v. Mike's Camera, Inc.

Plaintiff: Larry Elam-Floyd
Defendant: Mike's Camera, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01882
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [# 26 ] filed May 22, 2014, is APPROVED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/27/2014. (klyon, )
October 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/17/13. (ccovi)
September 26, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 9/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/13. (rebsec, )
July 17, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/26/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/17/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam-Floyd v. Mike's Camera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Elam-Floyd
Represented By: William Sidney Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Camera, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Harris Getches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?