Haines v. Archuleta
Petitioner: Christopher Haines
Respondent: Archuleta
Case Number: 1:2013cv01897
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 15 Order, by Clerk on 12/18/2013. (klyon, )
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER On 1 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 [Docket No. 1 ] filed by Christopher Haines on 7/17/2013 is DENIED and claim one is DISMISSED on the merits. Claim two is DISMISSED without prejudice. In forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of appeal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/28/13. (dkals, )
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER To File Preliminary Response by Respondent, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/18/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haines v. Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Archuleta
Represented By: James Xavier Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?