Heinrich v. Master Craft Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric A. Heinrich
Defendant: Master Craft Engineering, Inc., Auto Center Manufacturing Co., Autocraft Manufacturing Co., Inc. and JEG'S Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01899
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial 323 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/28/16. (jhawk, )
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. A ten-day jury trial on the docket of Judge Philip A. Brimmer in the Wayne Aspinall Building, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, Colorado, to commence on August 1, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for July 8, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A701. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/01/16. (jhawk, )
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. The Motion by Plaintiff to Set Trial 152 is denied. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/09/16.(jhawk, )
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Intra-Division Transfer of the Trial to Grand Junction, Colorado [Docket No. 133 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/02/2016. (athom, )
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. ORDERED that Master Craft's Motion for Summary Judgment 101 and Jegs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs Pursuit ofExemplary Damages and Regarding Plaintiff's Negligence Claim 102 are DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 103 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated in this order. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/18/15.(jhawk, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 90 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/18/2014.(ggall, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Strike by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/1/2014.(ggall, )
May 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/31/2014.(ggall, )
May 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER striking 47 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/24/2014.(ggall, )
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 12/9/2013 at 01:30 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/25/13. (mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinrich v. Master Craft Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A. Heinrich
Represented By: David A. Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Craft Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Center Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autocraft Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEG'S Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?