Jaramillo v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Lynard Jaramillo
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01978
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/05/2014. (athom, )
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Order the Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Designated Representative(s) to Appear for Their Deposition(s) in Denver, Colorado on April 23, 2014 and to Extend the Discovery Cutoff Date and the Dispositive Motion Deadline 24 is GRANTED. Discovery cut-off date is extended to April 23, 2014. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to May 16, 2014. FTR: C201. (sgrim)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/16/13. (sgrim)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/30/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Represented By: Steven R. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynard Jaramillo
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?